EP4126780 - GLASS-CERAMIC ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurokera S.N.C. 1 bis, Avenue du Général de Gaulle BP 182 - Chierry 02405 Château Thierry / FR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECOMTE, Emmanuel 31 rue Jean Eschard 02400 NESLES LA MONTAGNE / FR | 02 /
LUAIS, Erwann 3 rue des Fusiliers 02400 CHÂTEAU-THIERRY / FR | 03 /
DABOUINEAU, Jean-Luc 2 rue Sedillez 77140 NEMOURS / FR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21712552.5 | 22.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP57305 | Priority number, date | EP20200165037 | 23.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20165037 | FR20200002816 | 23.03.2020 Original published format: FR 2002816 | [2023/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191161 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126780 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4126780 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03C19/00, B24B7/24, B24B7/26, B24B19/00, B24B27/00, B24B29/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C03C19/00 (EP,KR);
B24B27/0053 (EP,KR,US);
B24B19/008 (EP,KR);
B24B27/0076 (EP,KR);
B24B29/00 (EP,KR);
B24B7/241 (EP,KR,US);
B24B7/244 (EP,US);
B24B7/265 (EP,KR);
C03B13/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASKERAMIKARTIKEL | [2023/06] | English: | GLASS-CERAMIC ARTICLE | [2023/06] | French: | ARTICLE VITROCERAMIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 24.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03086019 (EUROKERA [FR], et al); | [A]JP2009149468 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) | by applicant | JP2009149468 |