EP4111811 - PHYSICAL RANDOM ACCESS CHANNEL (PRACH) TRANSMISSION IN NEW RADIO (NR) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEWAIL, Ahmed Abdelaziz Ibrahim Abdelaziz 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
SUN, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
FAN, Zhifei 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
NAM, Wooseok 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 07 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 08 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21712640.8 | 23.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US19173 | Priority number, date | US202062981405P | 25.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062981405 P | US202117249167 | 22.02.2021 Original published format: US202117249167 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021173517 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111811 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04L27/26 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L27/26025 (EP);
H04L27/2607 (US);
H04L27/26132 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0016 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON PHYSIKALISCHEN ZUFALLSZUGRIFFSKANÄLEN (PRACH) IN NEW RADIO (NR) | [2023/01] | English: | PHYSICAL RANDOM ACCESS CHANNEL (PRACH) TRANSMISSION IN NEW RADIO (NR) | [2023/01] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE CANAL D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE PHYSIQUE (PRACH) DANS UNE NOUVELLE RADIO (NR) | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 30.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2017014715 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 1,18,28 * figures 6,7,9 *[Y] 6,7; | [X]EP3573381 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,18,28 * tables 3-2,3-3 *; | [XYI]US2019387546 (LI YINGZHE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,14,18-21,23,28 * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0139]; figures 13,14; table 1 * * paragraph [0320] - paragraph [0330] * [Y] 6,7 [I] 8,10-13,15-17,22,24-27,29,30; | [X] - SAMSUNG, "Initial Access Signals and Channels for NR-U", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, (20191007), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1910456 NR-U IA SIGNALS AND CHANNELS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1910456.zip R1-1910456 NR-U IA signals and channels.docx, (20191007), XP051808927 [X] 1,9,18,23,28 * page 7, line l - page 8; figure 5 * |