EP4150563 - UPSAMPLING LOW TEMPORAL RESOLUTION DEPTH MAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLEYER, Michael Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
PRICE, Raymond, Kirk Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
EDMONDS, Christopher, Douglas Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21712653.1 | 24.02.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US19307 | Priority number, date | US202015931535 | 13.05.2020 Original published format: US202015931535 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021230941 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150563 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/50, G02B27/01, H04N13/271 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T3/4053 (US);
G02B27/0093 (EP);
G02B27/017 (EP);
G06T5/00 (US);
G06T5/20 (US);
G06T7/593 (US);
H04N13/117 (EP);
H04N13/128 (EP);
H04N13/239 (EP);
H04N13/271 (EP);
H04N13/344 (EP);
G02B2027/0138 (EP);
G02B2027/014 (EP);
G02B2027/0178 (EP);
G06T2207/10021 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (EP);
G06T2207/20028 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | UPSAMPLING VON TIEFENKARTEN MIT GERINGER ZEITLICHER AUFLÖSUNG | [2023/12] | English: | UPSAMPLING LOW TEMPORAL RESOLUTION DEPTH MAPS | [2023/12] | French: | SURÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE CARTES DE PROFONDEUR À FAIBLE RÉSOLUTION TEMPORELLE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 05.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2019101758 (ZHU YOUDING [US], et al) [Y] 13 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0133] ** figure 5 *; | [IY] - YU-HSIANG CHIU ET AL, "Voting-based depth map refinement and propagation for 2D to 3D conversion", SIGNAL&INFORMATION PROCESSING ASSOCIATION ANNUAL SUMMIT AND CONFERENCE (APSIPA ASC), 2012 ASIA-PACIFIC, IEEE, (20121203), ISBN 978-1-4673-4863-8, pages 1 - 8, XP032309985 [I] 1-12,14,15 * abstract * * section III * [Y] 13 | [IY] - WANG HAOQIAN ET AL, "A novel depth propagation algorithm with color guided motion estimation", 2013 VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING (VCIP), IEEE, (20131117), doi:10.1109/VCIP.2013.6706419, pages 1 - 5, XP032543703 [I] 1-12,14,15 * abstract * * sections 2-3 * [Y] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VCIP.2013.6706419 | [IY] - LIE W-N ET AL, "2D to 3D video conversion with key-frame depth propagation and trilateral filtering", ELECTRONIC LETTERS, THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY, (20110303), vol. 47, no. 5, doi:10.1049/EL:20102912, ISSN 1350-911X, pages 319 - 321, XP006038253 [I] 1-12,14,15 * abstract * * section "Proposed method" * [Y] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/EL:20102912 |