EP4111125 - BALLISTIC COMPOSITION, BALLISTIC ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zephyros, Inc. 160 McLean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYNNESTVEDT, Blake 160 McLean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Jason 160 McLean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | 03 /
MORTAZAVIAN, Hamid 160 McLean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21712670.5 | 24.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US19464 | Priority number, date | US202062980594P | 24.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062980594 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021173709 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111125 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/04 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
F41H5/0492 (EP,US);
B32B13/02 (US);
B32B27/18 (US);
F41H5/0471 (US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2264/501 (US);
B32B2307/558 (US);
B32B2571/02 (US);
B32B27/38 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | BALLISTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, BALLISTISCHE ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/01] | English: | BALLISTIC COMPOSITION, BALLISTIC ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/01] | French: | COMPOSITION BALISTIQUE, ENSEMBLE BALISTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 26.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3431818 (KING HARRY A) [X] 1,2,4,15 * column 1, line 70 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, lines 35-69 * * column 5, lines 69-73 * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 3 [I] 17; | [X]US2009241764 (COHEN MICHAEL [IL]) [X] 1,2,4,15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0078] ** figures 5, 6 *; | [Y]US2010012004 (TELANDER WILLIAM L [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0004] , [0046] , [0127] *; | [XI]US2019041168 (GAMACHE RAYMOND M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0026] , [0030] , [0034] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 17 | by applicant | US3317471 | US4438254 | US4647648 | US5115075 | US6011111 | US2007270515 | WO2020206344 |