EP4111159 - ENVIRONMENTAL GROUNDWATER SAMPLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Q.E.D. Environmental Systems, Inc. 2355 Bishop Circle W. Dexter MI 48130 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMINSKI, David, B. 167 Mountaire Parkway Clayton, California 94517 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 21712696.0 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US19805 | Priority number, date | US202062981626P | 26.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062981626 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021173924 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111159 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/14 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G01N1/14 (EP,US);
G01N33/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | UMGEBUNGSGRUNDWASSERENTNAHMESYSTEM | [2023/01] | English: | ENVIRONMENTAL GROUNDWATER SAMPLING SYSTEM | [2023/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE D'EAU SOUTERRAINE ENVIRONNEMENTALE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 26.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002166663 (LAST GEORGE V [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0023] , [0 26] , [0 40] , [0 44]; figures 1, 2, 4,5 *; | [XI]US6508310 (MIODUSZEWSKI DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-14,16-18,20 * column 6, lines 8-551-4; figure 14 * [I] 3,4,15,19; | [XI]US2015233884 (BURGE SCOTT RUSSELL [US]) [X] 1,2,5-14,16-18,20 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0039] , [0041] , [0059]; figures 1,4 * [I] 3,4,15,19; | [XI]WO2019157192 (IN SITU INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-14,16-18,20 * paragraphs [0072] , [0 81] , [0 83] , [0 87] , [ 104]; figures 1-3, 6 * [I] 3,4,15,19 |