EP4126707 - LOGISTICS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Deutschland GmbH Zugspitzstraße 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUEHR, Thomas Anton-Bruckner-Str. 41 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Oelke, Jochen KUKA Aktiengesellschaft Zugspitzstraße 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21712797.6 | 16.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP56627 | Priority number, date | DE202010204272 | 01.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020204272 | [2023/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021197833 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126707 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B25J18/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
B65G1/04 (EP,US);
B25J11/00 (KR);
A01G9/088 (US);
A01G9/143 (KR);
A01G9/247 (KR);
A01G9/249 (KR);
B25J19/0025 (KR);
B25J19/005 (EP,KR,US);
B25J5/007 (US);
B25J5/02 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/0009 (EP,KR);
B25J9/042 (EP,KR,US);
B65G2203/0283 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | LOGISTIKSYSTEM | [2023/06] | English: | LOGISTICS SYSTEM | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈME LOGISTIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 13.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3941754 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]DE102004024077 (FREUND MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]WO2008091733 (BASTIAN MATERIAL HANDLING LLC [US], et al); | [A]DE102016222255 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]); | [A]CN207784804U (SHANGHAI LIANGKE ELECTRONICS TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2019109006 |