EP4121446 - FERRITIN VARIANTS WITH INCREASED STABILITY, COMPLEXATION ABILITY AND TRANSFERRIN RECEPTOR AFFINITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellis AG Bleicherweg 45 8002 Zürich / CH | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARCOVITO, Alessandro Via Michelangelo Tilli 44 00156 Rome / IT | 02 /
BONAMORE, Alessandra Via S. Mercadante 5/D 04011 Aprilia (LT) / IT | 03 /
BOFFI, Alberto Via Angelo Emo 117 Rome 00136 / IT | 04 /
MARSZALEK, Ilona ul. Stokrotki 1 05-870 Bramki / PL | 05 /
SKORZYNSKI, Marcin Bohaterow Warszawy 47A 96-300 Zyrardow / PL | 06 /
RYGIEL, Tomasz Powstancow Slaskich 89A/221 01-355 Warsaw / PL | 07 /
KROL, Magdalena Bruna 10/21 02-594 Warszawa / PL | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21712822.2 | 18.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021EP56996 | Priority number, date | EP20200164053 | 18.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20164053 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185986 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121446 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K35/15, A61K38/16 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
C07K14/79 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/644 (US);
A61P35/00 (US);
A61K35/15 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | FERRITINVARIANTEN MIT ERHÖHTER STABILITÄT, KOMPLEXIERUNGSFÄHIGKEIT UND TRANSFERRINREZEPTORAFFINITÄT | [2023/04] | English: | FERRITIN VARIANTS WITH INCREASED STABILITY, COMPLEXATION ABILITY AND TRANSFERRIN RECEPTOR AFFINITY | [2023/04] | French: | VARIANTS DE FERRITINE PRÉSENTANT UNE STABILITÉ, UNE APTITUDE À LA COMPLEXATION ET UNE AFFINITÉ POUR LE RÉCEPTEUR DE TRANSFERRINE ACCRUES | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 20.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2017222398 (CELLIS SP Z O O [PL]); | by applicant | US5582981 | WO2007002931 | WO2008083101 | WO2016207257 | WO2016207256 | WO2017222398 |