EP4128482 - STRUCTURE OF A MAGNETIC FLUX CONCENTRATOR FOR A ROTOR FOR A BRUSHLESS DC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Dore Le Vieux Chêne 35270 Bonnemain / FR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRAEN, Maxime C/O DELTA DORE Le Vieux Chêne 35270 BONNEMAIN / FR | 02 /
DUFEE, Julien C/O DELTA DORE Le Vieux Chêne 35270 BONNEMAIN / FR | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21712829.7 | 19.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP57076 | Priority number, date | FR20200002861 | 24.03.2020 Original published format: FR 2002861 | [2023/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021191073 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128482 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4128482 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/276 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H02K1/2773 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H02K1/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBAU EINES MAGNETFLUSSKONZENTRATORS FÜR EINEN ROTOR FÜR EINEN BÜRSTENLOSEN GLEICHSTROMMOTOR | [2023/06] | English: | STRUCTURE OF A MAGNETIC FLUX CONCENTRATOR FOR A ROTOR FOR A BRUSHLESS DC MOTOR | [2023/06] | French: | STRUCTURE D'UN CONCENTRATEUR DE FLUX MAGNETIQUE D'UN ROTOR DE MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU SANS BALAI | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 21.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 03.01.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 03.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5786650 (UCHIDA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]DE102007024406 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE102011122023 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]); | [A]EP2626975 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [A]FR3018009 (LEROY SOMER MOTEURS [FR]); | [A]WO2016182117 (NEW MOTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2017149317 (MANN THOMAS [DE]) | Examination | CN105703500 | CN105811608 | CN105827038 |