Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
04.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
15.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
15.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
22.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.10.2023 | Change - representative | |
13.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.09.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
20.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.09.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
29.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |