Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4302220 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202180094417 EP21713837 US2021020262W US202118548727



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2022186812Global Dossier 09.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
WO2021US20262 01.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024146540Global Dossier 02.05.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2021US20262 01.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN116830108Global Dossier 29.09.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2021US20262 01.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4302220Global Dossier 10.01.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2021US20262 01.03.2021