EP4103214 - GENE THERAPY VECTORS FOR TREATING HEART DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenaya Therapeutics, Inc. 171 Oyster Point Boulevard Suite 500 South San Francisco, Ca 94080 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOMBARDI, Laura c/o Tenaya Therapeutics Inc. 171 Oyster Point Boulevard Suite 500 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21714285.0 | 11.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021US17699 | Priority number, date | US202062976160P | 13.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062976160 P | US202063047633P | 02.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063047633 P | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021163357 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4103214 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61P9/00, C07K14/47, C12N15/86, A61K48/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
A61P9/10 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL);
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K48/0058 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP);
A61K48/005 (EP,IL);
A61K48/0075 (KR);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K14/4716 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N5/0657 (KR);
C12N5/0696 (KR);
A01K2217/075 (EP,IL);
A01K2227/105 (EP,IL);
A01K2267/0375 (EP,IL);
C07H21/04 (EP,US);
C12N15/8645 (US);
C12N2310/20 (KR);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | 13.09.2022 | ME | 13.09.2022 | Validation states | KH | 13.09.2022 | MA | 13.09.2022 | MD | 13.09.2022 | TN | 13.09.2022 | Title | German: | GENTHERAPIEVEKTOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HERZKRANKHEITEN | [2022/51] | English: | GENE THERAPY VECTORS FOR TREATING HEART DISEASE | [2022/51] | French: | VECTEURS DE THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIE CARDIAQUE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 13.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP2792742 (UNIVERSITÄTSKLINIKUM HAMBURG EPPENDORF UKE [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,13-20,29,30,32-44 * par.1,14, 17, 48, 52, 68 * [Y] 11,12,27,28,31; | [XY]US2018148488 (CHAMBERLAIN JEFFREY S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,13-15,21-23,25,29,33 * par.10, 251-254, SEQ ID NO.2 * [Y] 11,12,27,28,31; | [P] - "Sequence 2 from patent US 10479821.", EMBL, (20200214), Database accession no. MO519550, URL: EBI [P] * sequence . * | [XY] - MEARINI GIULIA ET AL, "Mybpc3 gene therapy for neonatal cardiomyopathy enables long-term disease prevention in mice", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1038/ncomms6515, (20141202), URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/ncomms6515.pdf, XP055851801 [X] 1-3,5-10,17,18,20-26,29,30,32-37,39-41 * p.3 Fig.1(b), p.2 col.2 par.2 * [Y] 11,12,27,28,31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms6515 | [XY] - WERFEL STANISLAS ET AL, "Rapid and highly efficient inducible cardiac gene knockout in adult mice using AAV-mediated expression of Cre recombinase", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, GB, vol. 104, no. 1, doi:10.1093/cvr/cvu174, ISSN 0008-6363, (20141001), pages 15 - 23, URL: https://watermark.silverchair.com/cvu174.pdf?token=AQECAHi208BE49Ooan9kkhW_Ercy7Dm3ZL_9Cf3qfKAc485ysgAAAugwggLkBgkqhkiG9w0BBwagggLVMIIC0QIBADCCAsoGCSqGSIb3DQEHATAeBglghkgBZQMEAS4wEQQM_hls76vkG2J_yWu0AgEQgIICmwvOncTTzu9xUQprS5UG1vb-NrGBLDXVss75ts7EvSv3V2EquMbkiJgHXqqJEX9Xb2xqENpWoQxSs2d1jGN2cRpYGO7cR, XP055851829 [X] 1,4 * p.16 col.1 par.4,p.16 col.1 par.6, p.17 col.2 par.1, Fig.2, p.17 col.2 par.2 * [Y] 11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/cvr/cvu174 | [Y] - MOSQUEIRA DIOGO ET AL, "CRISPR/Cas9 editing in human pluripotent stem cell-cardiomyocytes highlights arrhythmias, hypocontractility, and energy depletion as potential therapeutic targets for hypertrophic cardiomyopathy", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, GB, vol. 39, no. 43, doi:10.1093/eurheartj/ehy249, ISSN 0195-668X, (20181114), pages 3879 - 3892, URL: https://watermark.silverchair.com/ehy249.pdf?token=AQECAHi208BE49Ooan9kkhW_Ercy7Dm3ZL_9Cf3qfKAc485ysgAAAukwggLlBgkqhkiG9w0BBwagggLWMIIC0gIBADCCAssGCSqGSIb3DQEHATAeBglghkgBZQMEAS4wEQQMm8m_ABehOBRAatRPAgEQgIICnFgvOgmagJnnvIQkzzsCSWIfZ6P7p6SKmjiO2A233_fv_wh3TfO7cxSVI777Kl9IYoza2tkpUHnf_RwXhyo49q9puYfYn, XP055852374 [Y] 11,12 * p.3879 Abst., p.3880 col.1 par.2 - col.2 par.1, p.3889 col.2 par.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/eurheartj/ehy249 | [A] - TRUONG DONG-JIUNN JEFFERY ET AL, "Development of an intein-mediated split-Cas9 system for gene therapy", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, GB, vol. 43, no. 13, doi:10.1093/nar/gkv601, ISSN 0305-1048, (20150616), pages 6450 - 6458, URL: https://academic.oup.com/nar/article/43/13/6450/2414291, XP055791410 [A] 11,12 * p.6450 col.2 par.2 - p.6451 col.1 par.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkv601 | by applicant | US10889833 | WO2008124724 | US7892809 | US8632764 | US8889641 | WO2016054554 | US9475845 | US2016340393 | WO2017100671 | WO2017106236 | WO2017192750 | WO2017212019 | US2018066285 | US10011640 | WO2018152333 | WO2019028306 | US10480011 | WO2020117898 | WO2020191300 | WO2020198737 | US10894949 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSONLIPMAN, Proc. Nat'l. Acad Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nuc. Acids Res., (19770000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - GRAHAM et al., Virology, (19730000), vol. 52, page 456 | - CHU et al., Gene, (19810000), vol. 13, page 197 | - MARIANBRAUNWALD, Circ. Res., (20170000), vol. 121, pages 749 - 770 | - WALSH et al., Genet. Med., (20170000), vol. 19, pages 192 - 203 | - MARSTON et al., Circ. Res., (20090000), vol. 105, pages 219 - 222 | - VAN DIJK et al., Circulation, (20090000), vol. 119, pages 1473 - 1483 | - HELMS et al., Circ. Cardiovasc. Genet., (20140000), vol. 7, pages 434 - 443 | - ROTTBAUER et al., J. Clin. Invest., (19970000), vol. 100, pages 475 - 482 | - MOOLMAN et al., Circulation, (20000000), vol. 101, pages 1396 - 1402 | - VAN DIJK et al., Circ. Heart Fail, (20120000), vol. 5, pages 36 - 46 | - MCNAMARA et al., PLoS One, (20170000), vol. 12, page e0180064 | - BEVIS et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 20, no. 11, pages 83 - 87 | - MILLER, Nature, (20000000), vol. 357, pages 455 - 460 | - GRUNHAUS et al., Seminar in Virology, (19920000), vol. 200, no. 2, pages 535 - 546 | - BALAJI et al., J Surg Res, (20130900), vol. 184, no. 1, pages 691 - 698 | - PIRAS et al., Gene Therapy, (20160000), vol. 23, pages 469 - 478 | - ASOKARI et al., Hum Gene Ther, (20131100), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 906 - 913 | - POZSGAI et al., Mol Ther, (20170405), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 855 - 869 | - KOTTERMAN, M.A.D.V. SCHAFFER, "Engineering Adeno-Associated Viruses for Clinical Gene Therapy", Nature Reviews Genetics, (20140000), vol. 15, doi:10.1038/nrg3742, pages 445 - 451, XP055317129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg3742 | - IRIONS et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20070000), vol. 25, pages 1477 - 1482 | - CLARK et al., Hum Gene Ther, (19950000), vol. 6, pages 1329 - 41 | - DAMDINDORJ et al., PLoS One, (20140000), vol. 9, page e106472 | - PHILLIPS et al., Hypertension, (20020000), vol. 39, pages 651 - 5 | - KONKALMATT et al., Circ Cardiovasc Imaging, (20130000), vol. 6, pages 478 - 486 | - WU et al., Mol Ther, (20100000), vol. 18, pages 80 - 86 | - NASO et al., BioDrugs, (20170000), vol. 31, pages 317 - 334 | - CHOI et al., Curr Gene Ther, (20050000), vol. 5, pages 299 - 310 | - LIU et al., Curr Pharm Des, (20150000), vol. 21, pages 3248 - 56 | - ZINCARELLI et al., Mol. Ther., (20080000), vol. 16, pages 1073 - 1080 | - BIININGSRIVASTAVA, Mol Ther Methods Clin Dev, (20190000), vol. 12, pages 248 - 265 | - KATZ et al., Gene Ther, (20120000), vol. 19, pages 659 - 669 | - JASKI et al., JCardFail, (20090000), vol. 15, pages 171 - 181 | - MEARINI et al., Nat Commun, (20140000), vol. 5, page 5515 | - TOHYAMA et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20130000), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 127 - 37 | - LIAN et al., Proc Natl AcadSci USA, (20120000), vol. 109, no. 27, pages E1848 - 57 | - BURRIDGE PWHOLMSTROM AWU JC, Curr Protoc Hum Genet, (20150000), vol. 87, pages 2131 - 15 | - SCHLOSSAREK et al., Basic Res. Cardiol., (20120000), vol. 107, pages 1 - 13 | - LEKANNE DEPREZ et al., J Med Genet, (20060000), vol. 43, pages 829 - 832 | - XIN et al., Am J Med Genet Part A, (20070000), vol. 143A, pages 2662 - 2667 | - ZAHKA et al., Heart, (20080000), vol. 94, pages 1326 - 1330 | - MARZILIANO et al., Neonatology, (20120000), vol. 102, pages 254 - 258 | - WESSELS et al., Eur J Hum Genet, (20150000), vol. 23, pages 922 - 928 | - MEARINI et al., Nat. Commun., (20140000), vol. 5, page 5515 | US20030630127 |