EP4110457 - IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL LEAD WITH SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway N.E. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIKOLSKI, Vladimir P. 8200 Coral Sea Street NE Mounds View, Minnesota 55112 / US | 02 /
MARSHALL, Mark T. 8200 Coral Sea Street NE Mounds View, Minnesota 55112 / US | 03 /
WILKINSON, Jeffrey D. 8200 Coral Sea Street NE Mounds View, Minnesota 55112 / US | 04 /
THOMPSON-NAUMAN, Amy E. 8200 Coral Sea Street NE Mounds View, Minnesota 55112 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21714467.4 | 26.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US20041 | Priority number, date | US202062982790P | 28.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062982790 P | US202117185784 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: US202117185784 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021174093 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4110457 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39, A61N1/362, A61N1/05 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
A61N1/39622 (EP,US);
A61N1/36182 (US);
A61N1/3622 (EP);
A61N1/37512 (EP,US);
A61N1/0504 (EP,US);
A61N1/362 (EP);
A61N1/3918 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE LEITUNG MIT ABSCHIRMUNG | [2023/01] | English: | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL LEAD WITH SHIELD | [2023/01] | French: | FIL MÉDICAL IMPLANTABLE AVEC BLINDAGE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 12.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017354365 (ZHOU XIAOHONG [US]) [Y] 7* figure 4A *; | [XYI]US2018133458 (FOSTER ARTHUR J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,14,15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0038] - [0039]; figures 2,7,8A-8C * [Y] 7 [I] 9-13 |