EP4028194 - WIRE ELECTRODE FOR ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/29] | WIRE ELECTRODE FOR SPARK-EROSION CUTTING | ||
[2024/34] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berkenhoff GmbH Berkenhoffstrasse 14 35452 Heuchelheim / DE | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTHEL, Bernd Am Blosenberg 30 35239 Steffenberg / DE | 02 /
FLÜGGE, Stefan Brinkstrasse 20 58675 Hemer / DE | 03 /
NÖTHE, Tobias Am Gerichtsköppel 12 35745 Herborn / DE | 04 /
ZUNKE, Ivo Hinter der Ostanlage 5a 35390 Gie en / DE | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 21714902.0 | 30.03.2021 | [2022/29] | WO2021EP58275 | Priority number, date | EP20200167319 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20167319 | [2022/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021198245 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028194 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4028194 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/08, C25D7/06 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
C25D5/50 (EP,KR);
B23H7/08 (EP,KR,US);
B23H7/24 (US);
C25D7/0607 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTELEKTRODE ZUM FUNKENEROSIVEN SCHNEIDEN | [2022/29] | English: | WIRE ELECTRODE FOR ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE CUTTING | [2024/34] | French: | ÉLECTRODE FIL DESTINÉE À LA COUPE PAR ÉTINCELAGE | [2024/34] |
Former [2022/29] | WIRE ELECTRODE FOR SPARK-EROSION CUTTING | ||
Former [2022/29] | ÉLECTRODE À FIL POUR DÉCOUPE PAR ÉLECTROÉROSION | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 12.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2023 | Observations by third parties | 19.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5945010 (TOMALIN DANDRIDGE SALE [US]); | [A]JP2002126949 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO, et al); | [A]US2008179296 (LY MICHEL [FR], et al); | [A]US2016151848 (TOMALIN DANDRIDGE [US]) | by applicant | US5945010 | US6306523 | EP1295664 | EP1846189 | EP1949995 | US7723635 | EP2193867 | EP2517817 |