EP4114277 - SURGICAL TISSUE RETRACTOR HOLDING FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Encore Medical, L.P. dba DJO Surgical 9800 Metric Blvd. Austin, TX 78758 / US | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARPER, Keith 4704 Hixson Pike, Ste. 202 Hixson, TN 37343 / US | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21715010.1 | 02.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021US20400 | Priority number, date | US202062984363P | 03.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062984363 P | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021178365 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114277 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61B90/57, A61B17/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/0206 (EP,KR);
A61B90/57 (EP,KR);
A61B17/0218 (US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
A61B90/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | HALTERAHMEN FÜR CHIRURGISCHEN GEWEBERETRAKTOR | [2023/02] | English: | SURGICAL TISSUE RETRACTOR HOLDING FRAME | [2023/02] | French: | CADRE DE MAINTIEN D'ÉCARTEUR CHIRURGICAL | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 10.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2005215865 (LEVAHN STEVEN M [US], et al); | [A]WO2008055324 (NESTOROV STANISLAV [BG]); | [XA]US2013082157 (AGBODOE VICTOR [US], et al) |