EP4125778 - OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION COMPRISING A SOLID LIPID MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIEBER, Wolfgang Firmenich SA 7, rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 02 /
BEAUSSOUBRE, Pascal Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | 03 /
HARRACA, Vincent Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Dureisseix, Valérie Firmenich SA Corporate Legal & Compliance - IP Group 7, rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | Application number, filing date | 21715257.8 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP58191 | Priority number, date | EP20200167139 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20167139 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021198198 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125778 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06, A61Q17/02, A61K8/92, A61K8/73, A61K8/365, A61K8/34 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A61K8/062 (EP);
A01N37/20 (US);
A01N25/04 (US);
A01N25/22 (US);
A01N37/18 (US);
A01P7/00 (US);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSION MIT EINEM FESTEN LIPIDMATERIAL | [2023/06] | English: | OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION COMPRISING A SOLID LIPID MATERIAL | [2023/06] | French: | ÉMULSION HUILE DANS L'EAU COMPRENANT UN MATÉRIAU LIPIDIQUE SOLIDE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 31.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 03.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 03.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3479428 (BRYCE DOUGLAS MAXWELL, et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15 * examples 9,10 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 10 * * claim - * * column 6, line 36 - line 43 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO0243656 (AVON PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* example -; claim - *; | [Y]DE10349678 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * example - * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060] * * claim 5 *; | [Y]WO2019036774 (OREAL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * example - * * claim - * | by applicant | - A. LEO, Comprehensive Medicinal Chemistry, Pergamon Press, (19900000), vol. 4, page 295 |