Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024294720 | ![]() | 05.09.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202117195161 | 08.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202418655954 | 06.05.2024 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202318203289 | 30.05.2023 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024117135 | ![]() | 11.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202117195067 | 08.03.2021 | US202318540290 | 14.12.2023 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024084088 | ![]() | 14.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202117194812 | 08.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202318511567 | 16.11.2023 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024084087 | ![]() | 14.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202117194815 | 08.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202318511419 | 16.11.2023 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12084556 | ![]() | 10.09.2024 | B2 | US2023303796 | 28.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318203309 | 30.05.2023 | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202117195086 | 08.03.2021 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12031007 | ![]() | 09.07.2024 | B2 | US2023407033 | 21.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202117195161 | 08.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202318203289 | 30.05.2023 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11884791 | ![]() | 30.01.2024 | B2 | US2021354349 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202117195067 | 08.03.2021 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11866566 | ![]() | 09.01.2024 | B2 | US2021276294 | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202117194812 | 08.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11859067 | ![]() | 02.01.2024 | B2 | US2021276293 | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202117194815 | 08.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11702527 | ![]() | 18.07.2023 | B2 | US2021277199 | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202117195161 | 08.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11702526 | ![]() | 18.07.2023 | B2 | US2021354345 | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202117195086 | 08.03.2021 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4467316 | ![]() | 27.11.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | WO2021US21451 | 09.03.2021 | EP21715087 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4234221 | ![]() | 04.10.2023 | A3 | EP4234221 | 30.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | WO2021US21500 | 09.03.2021 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | EP21715095 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4234198 | ![]() | 09.10.2024 | B1 | EP4234198 | 27.09.2023 | A3 | EP4234198 | 30.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | WO2021US21535 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | EP21715396 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4234197 | ![]() | 27.09.2023 | A3 | EP4234197 | 30.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | EP21714773 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | WO2021US21499 | 09.03.2021 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4124435 | ![]() | 02.10.2024 | B1 | EP4124435 | 01.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | WO2021US21451 | 09.03.2021 | EP21715087 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4117901 | ![]() | 18.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | WO2021US21500 | 09.03.2021 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4117900 | ![]() | 18.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | WO2021US21499 | 09.03.2021 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4117881 | ![]() | 18.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | WO2021US21534 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4093591 | ![]() | 06.11.2024 | B1 | EP4093591 | 30.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | WO2021US21451 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN119078087 | ![]() | 06.12.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | CN202180018271 | 09.03.2021 | WO2021US21451 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115279578 | ![]() | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | WO2021US21500 | 09.03.2021 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115279568 | ![]() | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | WO2021US21534 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115243871 | ![]() | 25.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | WO2021US21499 | 09.03.2021 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115243856 | ![]() | 25.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | WO2021US21535 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115210057B | ![]() | 29.10.2024 | B | CN115210057 | 18.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | WO2021US21451 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4117882 | ![]() | 08.05.2024 | B1 | EP4117882 | 18.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | WO2021US21535 | 09.03.2021 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021183536 | ![]() | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021183535 | ![]() | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021183510 | ![]() | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021183509 | ![]() | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021183475 | ![]() | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI795742B | 11.03.2023 | B | TW202135697 | 01.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI841825B | 11.05.2024 | B | TW202138158 | 16.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI795741B | 11.03.2023 | B | TW202140250 | 01.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI792213B | 11.02.2023 | B | TW202146204 | 16.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI812569B | 11.08.2023 | B | TW202317349 | 01.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI830590B | 21.01.2024 | B | TW202322713 | 16.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI854738B | 01.09.2024 | B | TW202342261 | 01.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202416853 | 01.05.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062987224 | 09.03.2020 | US202062987227 | 09.03.2020 | US202063042324 | 22.06.2020 | US202063071393 | 28.08.2020 | US202062987648 | 10.03.2020 | US202163137872 | 15.01.2021 | US202062987329 | 09.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | EP4234198 |