EP4121211 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MILLING MATERIALS, IN PARTICULAR THERMOPLASTICS AND/OR ELASTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Boilesen-Hansen, Birgit Lehmkuhlen 3c 25337 Elmshorn / DE | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNEMANN, Holger Lehmkuhlen 3c 25337 Elmshorn / DE | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Bremer, Ulrich Advopat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theaterstraße 6 30159 Hannover / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 21715494.7 | 19.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021EP57063 | Procedural language | DE | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 27.03.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/18] | 12.04.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Date of registration [2024/20] | 06.03.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/20] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 12.04.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/20] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4121211 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/10] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 04 |