Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4313607 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2021435270 CN202180093562 EP2021058035W EP21715579 US202118550453 US202418609239



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2022199857Global Dossier 29.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024262119Global Dossier 08.08.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202318550453 13.09.2023
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
US202418609239 19.03.2024
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12059913Global Dossier 13.08.2024B2
US2024092106 21.03.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN116829365BGlobal Dossier 29.03.2024B
CN116829365 29.09.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2021435270Global Dossier 06.03.2025A9
AU2021435270 20.07.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4313607Global Dossier 30.04.2025B1
EP4313607 07.02.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112023017643 10.10.2023A2
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CO2023012539 09.10.2023A2
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CR20230508 15.02.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ECSP23080715 30.11.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2023011354 05.10.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SA523450894 12.01.2025B1
Priority number Date
WO2021EP58035 26.03.2021
TypeType Divisional application