EP4133710 - USE OF ELECTRIC OR HYBRID VEHICLES FOR TREATING AMBIENT AIR IN URBAN AREAS AND CONTROL CENTRE FOR MANAGING SUCH USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stellantis Auto SAS 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2023/50] |
Former [2023/07] | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAJOT, Karine 4 Allee Saint Fiacre 91370 Verrieres Le Buisson / FR | 02 /
PINTAT, Bruno 37 RUE DU DOCTEUR SCHWEITZER 92160 ANTONY / FR | 03 /
DUMUR, Denis 95 AVENUE DE LA BAYLIE 78990 ELANCOURT / FR | 04 /
BLOKKEEL, Gregory 70 RUE DE TOLBIAC 75013 PARIS 13 / FR | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21715948.2 | 10.03.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021FR50403 | Priority number, date | FR20200003554 | 09.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2003554 | [2023/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205088 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133710 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4133710 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/12 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP);
B60H1/00385 (EP);
B60H1/00778 (EP);
B60H1/008 (EP);
B60H3/06 (EP);
G08G1/207 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H04L29/08, G08G1/01, B60H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN ODER HYBRIDEN FAHRZEUGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON UMGEBUNGSLUFT IN STADTGEBIETEN UND KONTROLLZENTRUM ZUR VERWALTUNG DIESER VERWENDUNG | [2023/07] | English: | USE OF ELECTRIC OR HYBRID VEHICLES FOR TREATING AMBIENT AIR IN URBAN AREAS AND CONTROL CENTRE FOR MANAGING SUCH USE | [2023/07] | French: | UTILISATION DE VEHICULES ELECTRIQUES OU HYBRIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'AIR AMBIANT EN MILIEU URBAIN ET CENTRE DE CONTROLE POUR LA GESTION DE LADITE UTILISATION | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 12.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP3628388 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [A] 3-5,9-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0028] , [0038]; figure 3; claim 9 *; | [I] - Hyundai News Release, "Hyundai nexo cleans over 900kg of air during clean driving month", (20181112), URL: https://www.hyundai.news/eu/model-news/hyundai-nexo-cleans-over-900kg-of-air-during-clean-driving-month/, (20210211), XP002802096 [I] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph l - page 2, paragraph 3 * | [I] - Tony Markovich, "Hyundai Prophecy EV Concept is a rolling air purifier piloted by joystick", (20200403), URL: https://www.autoblog.com/2020/04/03/hyundai-prophecy-ev-concept-details-photos-video/#:~:text=Hyundai%20envisions%20a%20car%20like,when%20the%20vehicle%20is%20parked., (20210211), XP002802097 [I] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph l * | by applicant | FR2003554 | EP0707989 | EP3484194 | WO2019137822 |