EP4126894 - SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen BioPharma, Inc. 260 E. Grand Avenue, 2nd Floor South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Minghong c/o Janssen BioPharma, Inc. 260 E. Grand Avenue South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
JIN, Yi c/o Janssen BioPharma, Inc. 260 E. Grand Avenue, 2nd Floor South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
GALA, Dinesh c/o Janssen Research & Development LLC 920 US Route 202 P.O. BOX 300 Raritan, New Jersey 08869 / US | 04 /
PRHAVC, Marija c/o Janssen BioPharma, Inc. 260 E. Grand Avenue 2nd Floor South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Snaith, James Michael, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21715980.5 | 30.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021IB52595 | Priority number, date | US202063003067P | 31.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063003067 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021198883 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126894 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/00, C07H19/067, C07H19/167, C07H21/02 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
C07H21/02 (EP,IL,US);
C07H19/067 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07H1/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07H19/167 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,IL,KR);
Y02P20/55 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN UND VERWANDTEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2023/06] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS | [2023/06] | French: | SYNTHÈSE D'OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES ET DE COMPOSÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 11.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I] - V. A. EFIMOV ET AL, "Synthesis Of RNA by the Rapid Phosphotriester Method Using Azido-Based 2'-O-Protecting Groups", NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES & NUCLEIC ACIDS, US, (20090917), vol. 28, no. 9, doi:10.1080/15257770903170286, ISSN 1525-7770, pages 846 - 865, XP055304200 [I] 1-32 * Scheme 2, * * page 850, paragraph 2 - page 852, paragraph second last * * page 855, paragraph first * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15257770903170286 | [A] - KAWANAKA ET AL, "Synthesis of dinucleoside phosphates and their analogs by the boranophosphotriester method using azido-based protecting groups", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM , NL, (20070215), vol. 48, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.TETLET.2007.01.064, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 1973 - 1976, XP005890695 [A] 1-32 * tables 1-2 * * page 1976, paragraph first * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2007.01.064 | [A] - WADA TAKESHI ET AL, "2-(Azidomethyl)benzoyl as a new protecting group in nucleosides", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2009), vol. 42, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)02183-3, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 1069 - 1072, XP085040739 [A] 1-32 * Scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)02183-3 | by applicant | EP0540742 | US5753789 | WO9822489 | WO9839352 | WO9914226 | US6251666 | US6268490 | US6525191 | US6770748 | US6794499 | US7034133 | US7053207 | US7084125 | US7217805 | US7314923 | US7569575 | US7696345 | US9284344 | US2018282365 | US2018291056 | WO2018203574 | US10214555 | - MOLINA, A. G.SANGHVI, Y. S., "Liquid-phase oligonucleotide synthesis: Past, present, and future predictions", Current Protocols in Nucleic Acid Chemistry, (20190000), page e82 | - "Methods in Molecular Biology", PON, Protocols for Oligonucleotides and Analogs, Humana Press, (19930000), vol. 20 | - ASSELINE, Nucl. Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 19, pages 4067 - 74 | - GARBESI, Nucl. Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 4159 - 65 | - FUJIMORI, J. Amer. Chem. Soc., (19900000), vol. 112, page 7435 | - URATA, Nucleic Acids Symposium Ser. No., (19930000), vol. 29, pages 69 - 70 |