EP4295502 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING ORIENTATION OF AN ELECTRONICALLY STEERABLE ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viasat, Inc. Patent Department 6155 El Camino Real Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUER, Kenneth V. Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 21716004.3 | 08.03.2021 | [2023/52] | WO2021US21415 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022191820 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4295502 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04B7/18517 (EP,IL,KR);
G01S19/13 (US);
G01S13/74 (US);
H01Q1/52 (KR);
H01Q3/34 (KR);
H04B7/06952 (KR);
H04B7/18519 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER AUSRICHTUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCH LENKBAREN ANTENNE | [2023/52] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING ORIENTATION OF AN ELECTRONICALLY STEERABLE ANTENNA | [2023/52] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTERMINER L'ORIENTATION D'UNE ANTENNE ORIENTABLE ÉLECTRONIQUEMENT | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 21.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US6034634 (KARLSSON INGMAR [SE], et al) [X] 1,9,13,15,23,27 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 20 * * page 12, line 3 - page 14, line 18 * * figure - * * claim - * [A] 2-8,10-12,16-22,24-26 [I] 14,28; | [A]US6400927 (DANIEL BRIAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-28* the whole document *; | [A]US2006035588 (CHAPELLE MICHAEL D L [US]) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0041] * * figure - * * claim - *; | [A]US2021006326 (CROSS ERIC L [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0025] , [0028] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0062] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0067] * * figure - * * claim - * |