EP4133909 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE BRIGHTNESS OF INTERIOR LIGHTING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steinel GmbH Dieselstraße 80-84 33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUST, Christian Arndtstr. 3b 33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | 02 /
BORN, Torsten Im Hermstoffel 1 33813 Oerlinghausen / DE | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21716077.9 | 23.03.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021EP57472 | Priority number, date | DE202010109523 | 06.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020109523 | [2023/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021204538 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133909 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4133909 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05B47/11, H05B47/115, H05B47/155, H05B47/16 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
H05B47/11 (EP,US);
H05B47/115 (EP,US);
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
H05B47/16 (EP);
H05B47/175 (US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HELLIGKEITSREGELUNG VON INNENRAUMBELEUCHTUNGSMITTELN | [2023/07] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE BRIGHTNESS OF INTERIOR LIGHTING MEANS | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION DE LA LUMINOSITÉ DE MOYENS D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'INTÉRIEUR | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 31.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102010003804 (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,2,6,8-12 * figures 1-3 ** paragraphs [0031] - [0061] *; | [XI]US2018168020 (CASEY CRAIG ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-13 * figures 1, 3 * * paragraphs [0060] , [0 65] , [0 69] - [0073] - [0 79] , [0 93] - [0097] * [I] 4,5,7,14,15 |