EP4126711 - AUTOMATED STORAGE TOWER WITH CAROUSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autostore Technology AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAGERLAND, Ingvar Holevegen 8 5541 KOLNES / NO | 02 /
AUSTRHEIM, Trond Nedre Teigen 12 5590 Etne / NO | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 21716606.5 | 23.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021EP57502 | Priority number, date | NO20200000391 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: NO 20200391 | NO20200000752 | 26.06.2020 Original published format: NO 20200752 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021197942 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4126711 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
B65G1/045 (EP,KR,US);
B65G1/0464 (EP,KR);
B65G1/0478 (KR);
B65G1/065 (KR);
B65G2201/0235 (KR);
B65G2812/99 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTER LAGERTURM MIT KARUSSELL | [2023/06] | English: | AUTOMATED STORAGE TOWER WITH CAROUSEL | [2023/06] | French: | TOUR DE STOCKAGE AUTOMATISÉE DOTÉE D'UN CARROUSEL | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 10.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24200785.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2421387 (EATON GMBH); | [X]JPS62297050 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD); | [X]JPH0331105 (DAIFUKU KK); | [X]DE20206193U (P & P MATERIALFLUSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [XI]JP2004307125 (ASYST SHINKO INC) | by applicant | WO2014075937 | WO2014090684 | WO2015193278 | WO2018146304 |