EP4135508 - MULCHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müthing GmbH & Co. KG Wernsdorfer Straße 1 59955 Winterberg / DE | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜTHING, Michael Wiesenstraße 37 59955 Winterberg / DE | 02 /
BÖGGE, Klaus Schillerstraße 10 59519 Möhnesee-Günne / DE | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bergwaldstrasse 1 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21716653.7 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021EP58157 | Priority number, date | DE20201002342 | 17.04.2020 Original published format: DE102020002342 | [2023/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021209250 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135508 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/835, A01D34/43 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
A01D34/8355 (EP);
A01G3/002 (US);
A01D34/435 (EP);
B02C18/18 (US);
B02C2018/188 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | MULCHGERÄT | [2023/08] | English: | MULCHER | [2023/08] | French: | BROYEUR | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 19.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IAY]EP1782680 (MUETHING GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 2 * paragraphs [0032] - [0034]; figures 2,3a,3b,5-6 * [A] 7-9,15,16,19,20 [Y] 1-6,10-14,17,18; | [IAY]EP2997802 (MÜTHING GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 2 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-3 * [A] 7-9,15,16,19,20 [Y] 1-6,10-14,17,18; | [YA]EP3092889 (BERNARD KRONE GMBH & CO KG MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 1-6,10-14,17,18 * paragraph [0005]; figure 2 *[A] 7-9,15,16,19,20 | by applicant | EP1782680 | EP2997802 | EP3449710 |