EP4133691 - TRAFFIC MANAGEMENT FOR SMART NETWORK INTERFACE CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAINAR, Nagendra Kumar 241 Begen St. Morrisville, North Carolina 27560 / US | 02 /
PIGNATARO, Carlos M. 110 Sedgemoor Dr. Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21716914.3 | 15.03.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021US22298 | Priority number, date | US202016842457 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: US202016842457 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021206864 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133691 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/803 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/122 (EP);
H04L45/02 (EP,US);
H04L45/42 (US);
H04L45/64 (EP,US);
H04L41/046 (EP);
H04L41/0897 (EP);
H04L41/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | VERKEHRSVERWALTUNG FÜR SCHNITTSTELLENKARTEN EINES INTELLIGENTEN NETZWERKS | [2023/07] | English: | TRAFFIC MANAGEMENT FOR SMART NETWORK INTERFACE CARDS | [2023/07] | French: | GESTION DE TRAFIC POUR CARTES D'INTERFACE DE RÉSEAU INTELLIGENT | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 31.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016094667 (JANI NRUPAL R [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0013] , [0028] , [0029] , [0042] - [0045] *; | [A]US2018109471 (CHANG HYUNSEOK [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0021] , [0026] , [0057] - [0064] - [0091] - [0101] *; | [IY] - DURNER RAPHAEL ET AL, "HNLB: Utilizing Hardware Matching Capabilities of NICs for Offloading Stateful Load Balancers", ICC 2019 - 2019 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), IEEE, (20190520), doi:10.1109/ICC.2019.8761434, pages 1 - 7, XP033581939 [I] 1,3-8,10-15,17-20 * abstract * * sections I, II.A, II.B, IV * [Y] 2,9,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2019.8761434 | [Y] - MOHAMMADKHAN ALI ET AL, "P4NFV: P4 Enabled NFV Systems with SmartNICs", 2019 IEEE CONFERENCE ON NETWORK FUNCTION VIRTUALIZATION AND SOFTWARE DEFINED NETWORKS (NFV-SDN), IEEE, (20191112), doi:10.1109/NFV-SDN47374.2019.9040000, pages 1 - 7, XP033743466 [Y] 2,9,16 * sections I and II.C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NFV-SDN47374.2019.9040000 | [A] - UNKNOWN ET AL, "UNO : uniflying host and smart NIC offload for flexible packet processing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2017 SYMPOSIUM ON CLOUD COMPUTING , SOCC '17, New York, New York, USA, (20170927), doi:10.1145/3127479.3132252, ISBN 978-1-4503-5028-0, pages 506 - 519, XP055534207 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3127479.3132252 |