EP4139592 - ELECTROPNEUMATIC PERCUSSION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜBKERT, Ernst-Rudolf Staufenstraße 56 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | 02 /
PLANK, Uto Giggenhauser Str. 124 85354 Freising / DE | 03 /
ERHARDT, Jochen Bahnhofstrasse 22 A 86836 Klosterlechfeld / DE | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21717073.7 | 07.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021EP59072 | Priority number, date | EP20200170526 | 21.04.2020 Original published format: EP 20170526 | [2023/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021213804 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4139592 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/56, B25D11/12 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
B25D11/12 (EP,US);
B25D17/26 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0065 (EP,US);
B25D2250/121 (EP,US);
B25D2250/345 (EP,US);
B25D2250/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHES SCHLAGWERK | [2023/09] | English: | ELECTROPNEUMATIC PERCUSSION MECHANISM | [2023/09] | French: | MÉCANISME DE PERCUSSION ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2605998 (LICENTIA GMBH) [Y] 11* figure 1 *; | [X]EP1182012 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2009266572 (MEIXNER GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023]; figure 2 *; | [XYI]DE102013221117 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,12,14 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 11 [I] 3,4; | [X]EP2873488 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,6-8,12,14 * paragraph [0012]; figures 1-3 * |