EP4133232 - A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vahterus Oy Pruukintie 7 23600 Kalanti / FI | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIINIKKALA, Reima Hakulantie 63 23450 Lokalahti / FI | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21717490.3 | 30.03.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021FI50225 | Priority number, date | FI20200005367 | 06.04.2020 Original published format: FI 20205367 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205064 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4133232 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
F28D9/0006 (EP,FI,KR);
F28D9/0093 (EP,FI,KR);
F28D9/0062 (US);
F28D9/0043 (EP,FI,KR);
F28F3/08 (FI);
F28F9/001 (US);
F28F9/22 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHERANORDNUNG | [2023/07] | English: | A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER ARRANGEMENT | [2023/07] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR À PLAQUES | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 31.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]WO9109262 (KONTU MAURI [FI]); | [IA]EP0740949 (PACKINOX SA [FR]); | [XAI]EP2834578 (VAHTERUS OY [FI]); | [IA]WO2015070201 (TRANTER INC [US]) |