EP4121660 - AUTOMATIC AIR BLEEDING SYSTEM FOR HYDRAULICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woodward, Inc. 1081 Woodward Way Fort Collins, Colorado 80524 / US | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTKOWSKI, Krzysztof Woodward Poland Sp. z o.o. Skarbowa 32 32005 Niepolomice / PL | 02 /
REDZINA, Marek Kazimierz Woodward Poland Sp. z o.o. Skarbowa 32 32005 Niepolomice / PL | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21717677.5 | 16.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021US22558 | Priority number, date | US202062990037P | 16.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062990037 P | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021188531 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121660 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4121660 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F15B20/00, F15B19/00, F15B21/044, F15B21/08, F15B13/044, F15B13/04 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
F15B20/008 (EP);
F15B13/0435 (US);
F15B13/0402 (EP,US);
F15B13/0442 (EP,US);
F15B13/16 (US);
F15B19/005 (EP,US);
F15B20/002 (EP);
F15B21/044 (EP,US);
F15B21/087 (EP,US);
F15B9/03 (US);
F15B2013/0413 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3052 (EP);
F15B2211/30565 (EP);
F15B2211/3122 (EP,US);
F15B2211/327 (EP);
F15B2211/328 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6336 (EP);
F15B2211/634 (EP);
F15B2211/85 (EP,US);
F15B2211/8626 (EP,US);
F15B2211/8636 (EP,US);
F15B2211/864 (EP,US);
F15B2211/865 (EP,US);
F15B2211/8752 (EP);
F15B2211/8757 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES ENTLÜFTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR HYDRAULIK | [2023/04] | English: | AUTOMATIC AIR BLEEDING SYSTEM FOR HYDRAULICS | [2023/04] | French: | SYSTÈME AUTOMATIQUE DE DÉSAÉRATION POUR SYSTÈMES HYDRAULIQUES | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 22.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3225003 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE10103229 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2019383310 (ORTNER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) |