EP4122200 - HIGH LEVEL SYNTAX FOR VIDEO WITH MIXED NAL UNIT TYPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Yong 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SEREGIN, Vadim 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
COBAN, Muhammed Zeyd 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
RAMASUBRAMONIAN, Adarsh Krishnan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21717731.0 | 19.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021US23164 | Priority number, date | US202062992676P | 20.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062992676 P | US202063004105P | 02.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063004105 P | US202117205578 | 18.03.2021 Original published format: US202117205578 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021188898 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122200 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/169, H04N19/70 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/124 (KR);
H04N19/13 (KR);
H04N19/159 (EP,KR);
H04N19/172 (US);
H04N19/174 (EP,KR);
H04N19/176 (KR,US);
H04N19/188 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/40 (KR);
H04N19/597 (EP);
H04N19/96 (EP,KR);
H04N5/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | HOCHPEGELSYNTAX FÜR VIDEO MIT GEMISCHTEN NAL-EINHEITSTYPEN | [2023/04] | English: | HIGH LEVEL SYNTAX FOR VIDEO WITH MIXED NAL UNIT TYPES | [2023/04] | French: | SYNTAXE DE HAUT NIVEAU POUR VIDÉO AVEC TYPES D'UNITÉS DE COUCHE D'ABSTRACTION DE RÉSEAU (NAL) MIXTES | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 09.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015358629 (CHOI BYEONG-DOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-30* §0014, 0015 *; | [I] - SJÖBERG (ERICSSON) R ET AL, "AHG17: Bitstream constraints on RPL and GDR", no. JVET-P0356 ; m50323, (20191004), 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P0356-v2.zip JVET-P0356-presentation-v2.pdf, (20191004), XP030217055 [I] 1-30 * point 2. in "Proposal summary" on page 2 * * "Constraint 2" on page 4 * | [XPI] - HE (QUALCOMM) Y ET AL, "AHG9/AHG12: On mixed NAL unit types", no. m53244 ; JVET-R0267, (20200403), 130. MPEG MEETING; 20200420 - 20200424; ALPBACH; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/130_Alpbach/wg11/m53244-JVET-R0267-v1-JVET-R0267.zip JVET-R0267.docx, (20200403), XP030286326 [XP] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,14,21-23,25,26,29 * abstract * * section 1.3 * [I] 3,4,7,8,11,12,15-20,24,27,28,30 | [A] - Y-K WANG (FUTUREWEI) ET AL, "AHG12: On mixed NAL unit types within a picture", no. JVET-O0140 ; m48232, (20190709), 15. JVET MEETING; 20190703 - 20190712; GOTHENBURG; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/15_Gothenburg/wg11/JVET-O0140-v2.zip JVET-O0140-v2.docx, (20190709), XP030218717 [A] 1-30 * abstract * * section 1 * * subsections "Definitions" and "NAL unit header semantics" in section 2, page 2 * * first paragraph on page 3 * | [A] - HENDRY ET AL, "Random Access Detection and Notification", 98. MPEG MEETING; 28-11-2011 - 2-12-2011; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20111118), no. m21712, XP030050275 [A] 1-30 * section 2.1 * |