EP4125616 - DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR OCCLUDING CAVITIES WITHIN THE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laminar, Inc. 913 Turnberry Court Windsor, CA 95492 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASHINSKI, Randall T. 913 Turnberry Court Windsor, California 95492 / US | 02 /
DWORK, Joshua J. 913 Turnberry Court Windsor, California 95492 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Secerna LLP The Old Fire Station 18 Clifford Street York YO1 9RD / GB | Application number, filing date | 21717739.3 | 22.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US23475 | Priority number, date | US202062994240P | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062994240 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021194964 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125616 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/12, A61F5/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/12122 (EP);
A61B17/0057 (US);
A61B17/064 (EP);
A61B17/08 (EP);
A61B17/12131 (EP);
A61B17/12172 (EP);
A61B17/12177 (EP);
A61B17/068 (EP);
A61B2017/00243 (EP);
A61B2017/00592 (US);
A61B2017/00632 (US);
A61B2017/00663 (US);
A61B2017/00668 (US);
A61B2017/00818 (EP);
A61B2017/00893 (EP);
A61B2017/0641 (EP);
A61B2017/0649 (EP);
A61B2017/081 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN VON KÖRPERHÖHLEN | [2023/06] | English: | DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR OCCLUDING CAVITIES WITHIN THE BODY | [2023/06] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'OCCLUSION DE CAVITÉS DANS LE CORPS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 20.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2012316584 (MILES SCOTT D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10,11,16,20,24,26,46-48,58 * paragraphs [0133] - [0139] - [0141] , [0142] , [0144] , [0148]; figures 1A,2,3,3A,4D * [A] 4,6-9,12-15,17,18,22,25,27 [I] 19,21,23; | [XA]US2015005810 (CENTER CHARLES J [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0102] , [0117] , [0163] , [0166]; figure 19A * [A] 2-27,46-48,58; | [A]US2015005809 (AYRES BRIDGET B [US], et al) [A] 1-27,46-48,58* the whole document *; | [A]US2019321176 (LASHINSKI RANDALL [US], et al) [A] 1-27,46-48,58 * paragraph [0052]; figures 1A-4E *; | [A]US2019374229 (ANDERSON JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-27,46-48,58 * paragraphs [0097] , [0098]; figures 2,11 * |