EP4085365 - PRIVACY PRESERVING CROSS-DOMAIN MACHINE LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bai, Yijian Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
Wang, Gang Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk GST 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | Finlayson, Scott Henry, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21718356.5 | 19.03.2021 | [2022/45] | WO2021US23102 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022197304 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085365 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, G06Q30/02 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06F21/606 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
H04L2209/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | DOMÄNENÜBERGREIFENDES MASCHINELLES LERNEN MIT DATENSCHUTZBEWAHRUNG | [2022/45] | English: | PRIVACY PRESERVING CROSS-DOMAIN MACHINE LEARNING | [2022/45] | French: | APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE INTER-DOMAINE PRÉSERVANT LA CONFIDENTIALITÉ | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 15.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018174873 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0065] *; | [XI]US2020005180 (FRITCHMAN KYLE JOSIAH [US], et al) [X] 1,12-14,20 * figures 1-4, 6-7, 9-11 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0161] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0167] * * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0185] * [I] 2-11,15-19; | [I]WO2020205010 (GOOGLE LLC [US]) [I] 1-20 * figures 3, 4 * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2020372394 (KULKARNI VAIBHAV MURLIDHAR [IN], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0075] ** paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0083] * |