EP4128222 - TRANSFORM AMBISONIC COEFFICIENTS USING AN ADAPTIVE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2024/26] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Lae-Hoon 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
THAGADUR SHIVAPPA, Shankar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SALEHIN, S M Akramus 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Shuhua 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
VISSER, Erik 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21718451.4 | 24.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US23800 | Priority number, date | US202062994147P | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062994147 P | US202062994158P | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062994158 P | US202117210357 | 23.03.2021 Original published format: US202117210357 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021195159 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128222 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008, H04S3/02, // G10L25/30, G10L21/0216, G10L19/16, H04S7/00 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/038 (US);
G10L19/002 (US);
G10L25/30 (EP,KR);
H04R5/00 (US);
H04S3/02 (EP);
H04S7/302 (EP,KR);
G10L19/173 (EP);
G10L2021/02166 (EP,KR);
H04R2430/20 (EP,KR);
H04R2430/21 (US);
H04S2400/11 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | G10L19/008, H04S7/00, H04S3/00, G10L25/30, G10L21/0216 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | AMBISONIC-TRANSFORMATIONSKOEFFIZIENTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ADAPTIVEN NETZWERKS | [2023/06] | English: | TRANSFORM AMBISONIC COEFFICIENTS USING AN ADAPTIVE NETWORK | [2023/06] | French: | TRANSFORMATION DE COEFFICIENTS AMBIOPHONIQUES À L'AIDE D'UN RÉSEAU ADAPTATIF | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 08.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US10262665 (SEO JEONGHUN [KR], et al); | [XAI]US10419867 (SEO JEONGHUN [KR], et al); | [X]CN110544484 (ZHONGKE CHAOYING BEIJING MEDIA TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | US10477310 | US19570172103 |