EP4132566 - CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autolus Limited The MediaWorks 191 Wood Lane London W12 7FP / GB | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORDOBA, Shaun c/o Autolus Limited The MediaWorks 191 Wood Lane London W12 7FP / GB | 02 /
PULÉ, Martin c/o Autolus Limited The MediaWorks 191 Wood Lane London W12 7FP / GB | 03 /
BALDAN, Vania c/o Autolus Limited The MediaWorks 191 Wood Lane London W12 7FP / GB | 04 /
NICHOLSON, Alex c/o Autolus Limited The MediaWorks 191 Wood Lane London W12 7FP / GB | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21719219.4 | 08.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021GB50862 | Priority number, date | GB20200005216 | 08.04.2020 Original published format: GB 202005216 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205172 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132566 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K14/725, C12N5/00, C07K14/705, C12N9/16 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
A61K39/0008 (EP);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K2239/25 (EP,US);
A61K2239/26 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (US);
A61K38/1774 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4621 (EP,US);
A61K39/4622 (US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/4637 (US);
A61K39/46433 (US);
A61K39/46434 (EP,US);
A61K39/4644 (US);
A61K39/464411 (EP,US);
A61K39/464412 (US);
A61K39/464463 (US);
A61K39/46449 (US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K14/70532 (EP);
C07K14/70539 (US);
C07K14/70596 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12Y207/10002 (EP);
C12Y301/03016 (EP,US);
A61K2035/122 (US);
A61K2039/804 (EP);
A61K2239/11 (US);
A61K2239/17 (US);
A61K2239/46 (US);
A61K2239/57 (US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (US);
C07K2319/33 (US);
C12N2502/11 (US);
C12N2510/00 (US);
C12N5/0087 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | ZELLE | [2023/07] | English: | CELL | [2023/07] | French: | CELLULE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 25.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2018224844 (AUTOLUS LTD [GB]); | [XI]WO2019051001 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]); | [XDI]WO2019073248 (AUTOLUS LTD [GB]); | by applicant | WO2005023299 | US7052906 | US7381803 | WO2013153391 | WO2015132598 | WO2015150771 | WO2016030691 | WO2016124930 | WO2016151315 | WO2018224844 | WO2019073248 | WO2020089644 | GB20190004971 | WO2019GB53100 | GB20190019017 |