EP4146526 - MOBILE TRANSPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEGEN, Dirk 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Josef 76676 Graben-Neudorf / DE | 03 /
JUNGINGER, Alexander 75196 Remchingen- Wilferdingen / DE | 04 /
BOCKELMANN, Gero 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 05 /
TUSKAN, Andreas 75045 Walzbachtal / DE | 06 /
KÖDDERITZSCH, Jan-Patrick 76448 Durmersheim / DE | 07 /
ERB, Frank 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21719603.9 | 15.04.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021EP59822 | Priority number, date | DE20201002676 | 05.05.2020 Original published format: DE102020002676 | [2023/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021223975 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4146526 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4146526 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/02, B62D15/02, B62D63/02, B62D61/10 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
B62D61/10 (EP,US);
B62D15/021 (EP,US);
B62D63/02 (EP);
B62D7/023 (EP,US);
B62D7/04 (US);
B62D7/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES TRANSPORTSYSTEM | [2023/11] | English: | MOBILE TRANSPORT SYSTEM | [2023/11] | French: | SYSTÈME MOBILE DE TRANSPORT | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 05.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102007039611 (CRAMER SEBASTIAN [DE]); | [AD]DE102013019726 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]); | [AD]WO2018136987 (AMX AUTOMATION TECH GMBH [AT]) | by applicant | EP0672994 | DE102012025152 | DE102013019726 | DE102014015317 | DE102017201108 | WO2018136987 |