blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4309285

EP4309285 - ADAPTIVE LOGIC BOARD FOR VARIABLE SPEED DRIVE FOR HEATING, VENTILATION, AIR CONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.12.2023
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.09.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.04.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson Controls Air Conditioning And Refrigeration (Wuxi) Co., Ltd.
No. 22, National High-Tech
Investment & Development Zone D
Wuxi, Jiangsu 214000 / CN
For all designated states
Johnson Controls Tyco IP Holdings LLP
5757 N. Green Bay Avenue
Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US
[2024/04]
Inventor(s)01 / BORISOV, Konstantin Alex
Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2773 / US
02 / WARRINER, JonPaul
Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2773 / US
03 / OGALE, Anuradha Girish
Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2773 / US
04 / JIANG, Chenyi
Wuxi, Jiangsu 214000 / CN
05 / LU, Fei
Wuxi, Jiangsu 214000 / CN
 [2024/04]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Nürnberg
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2024/04]Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date21719845.618.03.2021
[2024/04]
WO2021CN81473
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022193213
Date:22.09.2022
Language:EN
[2022/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4309285
Date:24.01.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2022
ClassificationIPC:H03H7/01, F04D27/02, F24F11/63, F24F11/88, H02P27/06, H03H21/00
[2024/04]
CPC:
H03H7/0153 (EP); F24F11/63 (EP,US); F04D27/0261 (EP);
F24F11/52 (US); F24F11/88 (EP); H02P27/06 (EP);
H03H21/0001 (EP); H03H2210/012 (EP); H03H2210/028 (EP);
H03H2210/036 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/04]
TitleGerman:ADAPTIVE LOGISCHE PLATINE FÜR EINEN ANTRIEB MIT VARIABLER GESCHWINDIGKEIT FÜR EIN HEIZUNGS-, LÜFTUNGS-, KLIMATISIERUNGS- UND KÜHLSYSTEM[2024/04]
English:ADAPTIVE LOGIC BOARD FOR VARIABLE SPEED DRIVE FOR HEATING, VENTILATION, AIR CONDITIONING AND REFRIGERATION SYSTEM[2024/04]
French:CARTE LOGIQUE ADAPTATIVE POUR ENTRAÎNEMENT À VITESSE VARIABLE POUR SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE, DE VENTILATION, DE CLIMATISATION ET DE RÉFRIGÉRATION[2024/04]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2023National basic fee paid 
17.10.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2023Examination requested  [2024/04]
17.10.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB2116388  (COLE ELECTRONICS LIMITED);
 [XY]US2013021092  (BHATTACHARYYA PRASUN KALI [IN], et al);
 [Y]CN110968001  (HANGZHOU WOLEI INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.