EP4136036 - SIPLID FOR A CONTAINER HAVING A TWISTING EFFECT, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH SIPLID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huhtamaki Molded Fiber Technology B.V. Poolsterweg 3 8938 AN Leeuwarden / NL | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEENJE, Sandor Klaas c/o Poolsterweg 3 8938 AN Leeuwarden / NL | 02 /
PERIDY, Guillaume Daniel Bernard c/o Poolsterweg 3 8938 AN Leeuwarden / NL | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21720019.5 | 16.04.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021NL50245 | Priority number, date | NL20202025367 | 17.04.2020 Original published format: NL 2025367 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021210982 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4136036 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4136036 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/02, B65D47/08, B65D47/10, B65D65/46 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
B65D43/0212 (EP,US);
B65D47/0847 (EP,US);
B65D47/10 (EP);
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
D21H17/53 (US);
D21H17/675 (US);
D21H17/74 (US);
D21H27/10 (US);
D21J1/00 (US);
B65D2203/00 (US);
B65D2203/12 (EP);
B65D2251/1008 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00027 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00046 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00268 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00351 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00527 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00629 (US);
B65D2543/00685 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIPLID FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER MIT VERDREHUNGSEFFEKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN SIPLIDS | [2023/42] | English: | SIPLID FOR A CONTAINER HAVING A TWISTING EFFECT, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH SIPLID | [2023/08] | French: | SIPLIDE POUR UN RECIPIENT AYANT UN EFFET DE TORSION, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL SIPLIDE | [2023/42] |
Former [2023/08] | SIPLID FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER MIT TWIST-EFFEKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCH EINES SIPLIDS | ||
Former [2023/08] | COUVERCLE À BOIRE POUR UN RÉCIPIENT AYANT UN EFFET DE TORSION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL COUVERCLE À BOIRE | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 03.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0230783 (RADNOR DELAWARE INC [US]) [A] 1-14* page 5, lines 19-27; figure - *; | [A]US2006255037 (HOLLIS ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0017] , [0055] , [0064] , [0065] , [0066]; figure - *; | [A]US2014048552 (WANG GAOYUAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008]; figure - *; | [A]US2019359393 (LAYOS AARON [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0042] , [0044] , [0051]; figure - * |