EP4128986 - ENABLING GROUP LEADER- OR BASE STATION-BASED SIDELINK TRANSMIT POWER CONTROL AND RADIO LINK MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GULATI, Kapil QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Hong QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
AKKARAKARAN, Sony QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
RYU, Jung Ho QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LI, Junyi QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
LUO, Tao QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21720367.8 | 31.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US25194 | Priority number, date | US202063003121P | 31.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063003121 P | US202117217878 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: US202117217878 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021202747 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4128986 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/14, H04W4/40, H04W72/02, H04W92/18 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H04B17/318 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (US);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W28/0268 (EP);
H04W4/08 (EP);
H04W4/40 (EP);
H04W40/22 (EP);
H04W52/262 (EP);
H04W52/265 (US);
H04W52/42 (EP);
H04W76/14 (EP);
H04W76/19 (US);
H04W28/0958 (EP);
H04W92/18 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | ERMÖGLICHUNG EINER GRUPPENLEITER- ODER BASISSTATIONSBASIERTEN SIDELINK-SENDELEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG UND FUNKSTRECKENVERWALTUNG | [2023/06] | English: | ENABLING GROUP LEADER- OR BASE STATION-BASED SIDELINK TRANSMIT POWER CONTROL AND RADIO LINK MANAGEMENT | [2023/06] | French: | COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE DE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON LATÉRALE BASÉE SUR UNE STATION DE BASE OU UN CHEF DE GROUPE D'ACTIVATION ET GESTION DE LIAISON RADIO | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 28.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP3206321 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0137] - [0257]; figures 1,3-11; claims 1-15 *; | [X] - "LTE; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (3GPP TS 36.321 version 15.8.0 Release 15)", vol. 3GPP RAN, no. V15.8.0, (20200117), pages 1 - 137, ETSI TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.etsi.org/deliver/etsi_ts/136300_136399/136321/15.08.00_60/ts_136321v150800p.pdf, (20200117), XP014360448 [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [5.1.1] - [07.1] * |