EP4125566 - PACING EFFICACY DETERMINATION USING A REPRESENTATIVE MORPHOLOGY OF EXTERNAL CARDIAC SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOSH, Subham 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21720607.7 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US24652 | Priority number, date | US202063001867P | 30.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063001867 P | US202117193260 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: US202117193260 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021202379 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125566 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4125566 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/349, A61B5/00, A61B5/0245, A61B5/282, A61B5/35, A61B5/367, A61B7/02, G16H20/30, G16H40/67 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
A61B5/35 (EP,US);
A61B5/367 (EP);
A61B5/686 (EP,US);
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61B2562/043 (EP);
A61B2562/046 (EP);
A61B2562/063 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | A61B5/024, A61B5/0245, A61B5/00, A61B5/349 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER REIZUNGSWIRKSAMKEIT MITTELS REPRÄSENTATIVER MORPHOLOGIE EXTERNER HERZSIGNALE | [2023/06] | English: | PACING EFFICACY DETERMINATION USING A REPRESENTATIVE MORPHOLOGY OF EXTERNAL CARDIAC SIGNALS | [2023/06] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'EFFICACITÉ DE STIMULATION À L'AIDE D'UNE MORPHOLOGIE REPRÉSENTATIVE DE SIGNAUX CARDIAQUES EXTERNES | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 03.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24193069.2 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008064682 (UNIV AALBORG [DK], et al); | [XI]US2017246461 (GHOSH SUBHAM [US]); | [XI]US2019290909 (GHOSH SUBHAM [US], et al); | [XI]US2020069949 (GHOSH SUBHAM [US]); | [XPI]US2020261731 (GHOSH SUBHAM [US]); | [XPI]WO2020226754 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) | Examination | US2020352470 | by applicant | US2005008210 | US6980675 | US2006074285 | US7286866 | US7308297 | US7308299 | US7321677 | US7346381 | US7454248 | US7499743 | US7565190 | US7587074 | US7599730 | US7613500 | US7742629 | US7747047 | US7778685 | US7778686 | US7813785 | US7996063 | US8060185 | US8401616 | US8731642 | US8861830 | US2014323892 | US2014323882 | US2014371832 | US2014371833 | US9119959 | US9278229 | US9320446 | US9675579 | US2017303840 | US2018263522 |