EP4143505 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING THE PROFILE OF A SURFACE MOVING IN RELATION TO THE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3 Rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITE PAUL SABATIER TOULOUSE III 118 Route de Narbonne 31062 Toulouse Cedex 9 / FR | For all designated states Institut National Polytechnique de Toulouse 6 Allée Emilie Monso BP 34038 31029 Toulouse Cedex 4 / FR | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3 Rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE PAUL SABATIER TOULOUSE III 118 Route de Narbonne 31062 Toulouse Cedex 9 / FR | |||
For all designated states Institut National Polytechnique de Toulouse 6 allée Emile Monso BP 34038 31029 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMALDI, Bastien 20135 Conca / FR | 02 /
BREMOND, Florian 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 03 /
COTE, Remi 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 04 /
BOSCH, Thierry 31500 Toulouse / FR | 05 /
BONY, Francis 31590 Lavalette / FR | 06 /
LOUBES, Jean-Michel 31320 Pechbusque / FR | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/10] | 01 /
GRIMALDI, Bastien 20135 CONCA / FR | ||
02 /
BREMOND, Florian 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND Cedex 9 / FR | |||
03 /
COTE, Remi 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND Cedex 9 / FR | |||
04 /
BOSCH, Thierry 31500 TOULOUSE / FR | |||
05 /
BONY, Francis 31590 LAVALETTE / FR | |||
06 /
LOUBES, Jean-Michel 31320 PECHBUSQUE / FR | Representative(s) | M.F.P. Michelin DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2024/36] |
Former [2023/10] | Béniguel, Jean-François Joseph Emile Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin Service juridique - Propriété Intellectuelle DCJ/PI - F35 - Site de Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21721108.5 | 27.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021EP60969 | Priority number, date | FR20200004164 | 27.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2004164 | [2023/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219629 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143505 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4143505 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G01B11/24, G01B11/30, G01B9/02001, G01B9/02015, G01B9/02055 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
G01B11/303 (EP);
G01B11/2441 (EP,US);
G01B9/02007 (EP);
G01B9/02022 (EP);
G01B9/02028 (EP);
G01B9/02045 (EP);
G01B9/02082 (EP);
G01B9/02083 (EP);
G01B9/02084 (EP);
G01B9/02087 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | G01B9/02, G01B11/24, G01B11/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG DES PROFILS EINER RELATIV ZU DEM SYSTEM BEWEGTEN OBERFLÄCHE | [2023/10] | English: | METHOD FOR OBTAINING THE PROFILE OF A SURFACE MOVING IN RELATION TO THE SYSTEM | [2023/10] | French: | PROCEDE D'OBTENTION DU PROFIL D'UNE SURFACE EN MOUVEMENT PAR RAPPORT AU SYSTEME | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 28.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 19.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0208276 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2011126617 (BENGOECHEA APEZTEGUIA JAIONE [DE], et al); | [A]EP3035001 (SICK STEGMANN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2018216927 (VYACHESLAV ARANCHUK [US]) |