EP4138819 - DOSING REGIMEN FOR TREATING A DISEASE MODULATED BY CSF-1R [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JULLION, Astrid Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 02 /
MEILLE, Christophe Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 03 /
QUADT, Cornelia Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 04 /
ROY, Michael John Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation One Health Plaza East Hanover, New Jersey 07936 / US | 05 /
WIESMANN, Marion Novartis Pharma AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Didelon, Frédéric Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Ridout, Joseph Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 21721204.2 | 19.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021IB53198 | Priority number, date | US202063013151P | 21.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063013151 P | US202163145780P | 04.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163145780 P | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021214623 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138819 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4152, A61K31/428, A61K31/4439, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P21/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P35/04 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4152 (EP,IL);
A61K31/428 (EP,IL);
A61K39/3955 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P21/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL);
A61P35/04 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4152, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/428, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | DOSIERSCHEMA ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER DURCH CSF-1R MODULIERTEN KRANKHEIT | [2023/09] | English: | DOSING REGIMEN FOR TREATING A DISEASE MODULATED BY CSF-1R | [2023/09] | French: | SCHÉMA POSOLOGIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE MODULÉE PAR LE CSF-1R | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2018178852 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]); | [I]WO2019099838 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | by applicant | WO2006121168 | WO2007121484 | US7332582 | US7488802 | WO2009114335 | US7695715 | US8008449 | WO2012145493 | US8354509 | US8686119 | US8735553 | WO2014179664 | WO2014194302 | WO2014209804 | US8927697 | US8993731 | WO2015085847 | WO2015112800 | US9102727 | US9205148 | WO2015200119 | WO2016092419 | WO2016CN99494 |