Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4138799
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
02.06.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.04.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
14.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
27.01.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
27.01.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
03.01.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
22.11.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
09.09.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
29.10.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
04.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|