Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230004737 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 | WO2021IB53202 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115916169 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 | WO2021IB53202 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3175080 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 | WO2021IB53202 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021260165 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 | WO2021IB53202 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4138799 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 | WO2021IB53202 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022021418 | 13.12.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 | WO2021IB53202 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022013337 | 15.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 | WO2021IB53202 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021214624 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021330698 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016856735 | 23.04.2020 |