EP4138898 - REPLICATION-COMPETENT CONTROLLED HERPESVIRUSES EXPRESSING A SARS COV-2 ANTIGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HSF Pharmaceuticals 67 avenue de Sully 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOELLMY, Richard Avenue de Sully 67 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz Vaud / CH | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Völlmy, Lukas c/o HSF Pharmaceuticals Avenue de Sully 67 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21721486.5 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021EP60640 | Priority number, date | US202063101296P | 24.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063101296 P | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021214279 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138898 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61K39/215, A61K39/00 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
A61K39/215 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (US);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (US);
C07K14/005 (US);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (US);
C12N2710/10334 (EP);
C12N2710/16611 (EP);
C12N2710/16634 (EP);
C12N2710/16643 (EP);
C12N2770/20034 (EP);
C12N2800/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | REPLIKATIONSKOMPETENTE KONTROLLIERTE HERPESVIREN, DIE EIN SARS-COV-2-ANTIGEN EXPRIMIEREN | [2023/09] | English: | REPLICATION-COMPETENT CONTROLLED HERPESVIRUSES EXPRESSING A SARS COV-2 ANTIGEN | [2023/09] | French: | VIRUS DE L'HERPÈS CONTRÔLÉ CAPABLE DE SE RÉPLIQUER EXPRIMANT UN ANTIGÈNE DU SARS-COV-2 | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 20.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9925860 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2016030392 (HSF PHARMACEUTICALS [CH]); | [Y]WO2019170871 (HSF PHARMACEUTICALS [CH]); | by applicant | US3951127 | US4379448 | US4460546 | US5508269 | US5767068 | WO9843650 | US5952220 | US6014969 | US2008035143 | US7906312 | US8137947 | US20060478486 |