EP4146907 - FEEDTHROUGH CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COX, Thomas Ulverston LA12 9HJ / GB | 02 /
CHAMBERLAIN, Martin Milnthorpe LA7 7DX / GB | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21721867.6 | 15.04.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021EP59825 | Priority number, date | GB20200006652 | 05.05.2020 Original published format: GB 202006652 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021223976 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4146907 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4146907 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/038, E21B47/135, G02B6/38, H01R13/523 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
E21B33/038 (EP,GB,US);
E21B33/0385 (GB);
E21B47/135 (EP,GB);
G02B6/38 (GB);
G02B6/3816 (EP);
H01R13/502 (EP,US);
H01R13/5202 (EP,US);
H01R13/523 (EP,GB,US);
G02B6/506 (EP);
H01R2201/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNGSVERBINDER | [2023/11] | English: | FEEDTHROUGH CONNECTOR | [2023/11] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE TRAVERSÉE | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 19.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2665136 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0090] , [0092]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2017175476 (PAINTER DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0046] , [0077] *; | [A]CN104993298B (CHINA AVIAT OPTICAL ELEC TECH) [A] 1-14* abstract * | Examination | US2020044382 | US10938144 |