EP4146408 - COATING SYSTEMS WITH INCREASED JETNESS OF BLACK AND IMPROVED COLOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/11] | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERRIS, Daniel, Patrick Southfield, Michigan 48033 / US | 02 /
GARCIA, Rosalva, Castrejon Charlotte, North Carolina 28273 / US | 03 /
CAMPBELL, Donald, H. Southfield, MI 48033 / US | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/11] | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 21722255.3 | 04.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021EP61684 | Priority number, date | EP20200172676 | 04.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20172676 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021224232 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4146408 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4146408 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/06, B05D7/00 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
B05D5/06 (EP,KR,US);
B05D7/532 (EP,KR);
B05D7/572 (EP,KR,US);
C09D17/003 (US);
C09D7/67 (US);
C09D7/68 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEME MIT ERHÖHTER FARBTIEFE VON SCHWARZ UND VERBESSERTE FARBE | [2023/51] | English: | COATING SYSTEMS WITH INCREASED JETNESS OF BLACK AND IMPROVED COLOR | [2023/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE REVÊTEMENT À PROFONDEUR DE NOIR ACCRU ET COULEUR AMÉLIORÉE | [2023/51] |
Former [2023/11] | BESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEME MIT ERHÖHTER SCHWARZSTRAHLFÄHIGKEIT UND VERBESSERTER FARBE | ||
Former [2023/11] | SYSTÈMES DE REVÊTEMENT PRÉSENTANT UNE PROFONDEUR DE NOIR ACCRUE ET UNE COULEUR AMÉLIORÉE | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 05.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003185993 (KAMIMORI ISAO [JP], et al); | [AD]WO2012170230 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0228003 | DE4009858 | WO9115528 | WO9215405 | US5270399 | EP0634431 | DE4437535 | DE4438504 | EP0593454 | EP0787159 | EP0994117 | DE19948004 | EP1273640 | WO2005021168 | US2008187708 | WO2008148555 | US2012308724 | WO2012170230 | WO2013037928 | WO2014033135 | JP2014210856 | WO2016116299 |