EP4144147 - MESSAGE PRIORITIZATION IN RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jingya 417 58 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
LIN, Zhipeng Nanjing, Jiangsu 211100 / CN | 03 /
SAHLIN, Henrik 435 41 Mölnlycke / SE | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21722435.1 | 28.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021EP61066 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN87782 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/087782 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219690 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144147 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4144147 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/28, H04W52/08, H04W52/32, H04W52/36, H04W74/00, // H04W74/08 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
H04W74/002 (EP);
H04W74/0875 (US);
H04W52/08 (EP);
H04W52/281 (EP,US);
H04W52/325 (EP);
H04W52/362 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | H04W52/28, H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENPRIORISIERUNG IN EINEM DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN | [2023/10] | English: | MESSAGE PRIORITIZATION IN RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE | [2023/10] | French: | HIÉRARCHISATION DE MESSAGES DANS UNE PROCÉDURE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 01.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 |