EP4149904 - FINELY GROUND GRANULATED BLAST-FURNACE SLAG IN A CEMENT-BASED MULTICOMPONENT MORTAR SYSTEM FOR USE AS AN INORGANIC CHEMICAL FIXING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖNLEIN, Markus 82205 Gilching / DE | 02 /
PFEIL, Armin 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | 03 /
MIDDENDORF, Bernhard 34379 Calden / DE | 04 /
SCHADE, Tim 34125 Kassel / DE | 05 /
WETZEL, Alexander 34302 Guxhagen / DE | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21722921.0 | 06.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021EP62009 | Priority number, date | EP20200174882 | 15.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20174882 | [2023/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021228680 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149904 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/00, C04B40/06 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
C04B40/065 (EP,US);
C04B28/26 (US);
C04B14/06 (US);
C04B18/146 (US);
C04B22/062 (US);
C04B28/006 (EP);
C04B40/0042 (US);
C04B2103/10 (US);
C04B2111/00715 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/006, C04B12/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/10, C04B14/22, C04B14/26, C04B14/28, C04B14/303, C04B14/305, C04B18/08, C04B18/141, C04B18/146, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B40/065, C04B2103/54 (EP);
C04B28/006, C04B12/04, C04B14/06, C04B18/141, C04B18/146, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B40/065 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | FEIN AUFGEMAHLENER HÜTTENSAND IN EINEM ZEMENTÄREN MEHRKOMPONENTEN-MÖRTELSYSTEM FÜR DEN EINSATZ ALS ANORGANISCHES CHEMISCHES BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/12] | English: | FINELY GROUND GRANULATED BLAST-FURNACE SLAG IN A CEMENT-BASED MULTICOMPONENT MORTAR SYSTEM FOR USE AS AN INORGANIC CHEMICAL FIXING SYSTEM | [2023/12] | French: | LAITIER GRANULÉ DE HAUT FOURNEAU FINEMENT BROYÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME DE MORTIER MULTICOMPOSANTS À BASE DE CIMENT, DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ COMME SYSTÈME DE SCELLEMENT CHIMIQUE INORGANIQUE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 15.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1236702 (HEIDELBERGER BAUCHEMIE GMBH MA [DE]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 17] , [0 19]; claims 1-10 *; | [YA]WO2010017571 (SCHWARZ WOLFGANG [AT]) [Y] 11-13 * page 1, line 3 - line 5; examples 1-6; claims 1-33 * * page 4, line 6 - line 14 * * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 16 * [A] 1-10; | [XYI]EP2297061 (CONSTR RES & TECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 18] , [0 38]; example M1; claims 1-9; table 1 * [Y] 11-13 [I] 8 |