EP4114289 - PINCH-TO-RELEASE CANNULA DEPTH LIMITER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cilag GmbH International Gubelstrasse 34 6300 Zug / CH | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTHUCHIDAMBARAM, Arunachalam Madurai 625016 Tabil Nadu / IN | 02 /
VIJAYACHANDRAN, Sajayesh Kannur 670693 Kerala / IN | 03 /
RADHAKRISHNAN, Arunkumar 638183 Namakkal Dt / IN | 04 /
SURYAWANSHI, Rushikesh Shrikant 415206 Zenda chowk Patan / IN | 05 /
DHIVAKAR, A. 303304 Tamil Nadu / IN | 06 /
MATHIVANAN, Giri Prasannakumar puri Tamil 636402 Nadu / IN | 07 /
MCLAIN, Cameron D. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 08 /
VALENTE, Lauren M. Macomb, Michigan 48044 / US | 09 /
CORBIN, Matthew S. Irwindale, California 91706 / US | 10 /
SCOTT, Gregory G. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 11 /
NAGARATHINAM, Haribaskaran Aruppukottai 626134 Tamil-Nadu / IN | [2023/36] |
Former [2023/02] | 01 /
MUTHUCHIDAMBARAM, Arunachalam Madurai 625016 Tabil Nadu / IN | ||
02 /
VIJAYACHANDRAN, Sajayesh Kannur 670693 Kerala / IN | |||
03 /
RADHAKRISHNAN, Arunkumar ara 638183 Namakkal Dt / IN | |||
04 /
SURYAWANSHI, Rushikesh Shrikant ara 415206 Zenda chowk Patan / IN | |||
05 /
DHIVAKAR, A. 303304 Tamil Nadu / IN | |||
06 /
MATHIVANAN, Giri Prasannakumar puri Tamil 636402 Nadu / IN | |||
07 /
MCLAIN, Cameron D. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | |||
08 /
VALENTE, Lauren M. Macomb, Michigan 48044 / US | |||
09 /
CORBIN, Matthew S. Irwindale, California 91706 / US | |||
10 /
SCOTT, Gregory G. Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | |||
11 /
NAGARATHINAM, Haribaskaran 626134 Tamil-Nadu / IN | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21723212.3 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021EP61456 | Priority number, date | IN202011018670 | 01.05.2020 Original published format: IN202011018670 | US202117213302 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: US202117213302 | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219875 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114289 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4114289 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/3421 (EP);
A61B17/3423 (US);
A61B17/3439 (US);
A61B2017/3429 (US);
A61B2017/349 (EP);
A61B2017/3492 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINKLEMM-FREIGABE-KANÜLENTIEFENBEGRENZER | [2023/02] | English: | PINCH-TO-RELEASE CANNULA DEPTH LIMITER | [2023/02] | French: | LIMITEUR DE PROFONDEUR DE CANULE À PINCEMENT | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 03.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 31.01.2024 | |
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 30.04.2024 | |
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2015049391 (NEOSURGICAL LTD [IE]) [X] 1-8,10-14,18-20 * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 18; figures 2,3,5,8 * * page 11, lines 17-32 * [A] 16,17 [I] 9,15; | [A]WO2017132004 (MEDOVEX CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0096]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2018206883 (MCINTYRE TODD D [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0014]; figures 1-5 * | Examination | WO2015049391 | WO2017132004 | US2018206883 | by applicant | US5792135 | US7981092 | US8226553 | US8251900 | US8479969 | US8568362 | US8573465 | US8579807 | US8636686 | US8690831 | US8783541 | US8800838 | US2019000496 | US2019090905 | US2019380742 |