EP4146304 - SUPPLEMENTAL DEVICE FOR AN INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARVEY-COOK, Adam, Moyo Essex CM12 OUD / GB | 02 /
PLUMPTRE, David, Aubrey Worcestershire WR9 7RQ / GB | 03 /
GAZELEY, Oliver, Charles 4058 Basel / CH | 04 /
VEASEY, Robert Warwick Warwickshire CV34 4AB / GB | 05 /
O'HARE, Aidan, Michael Warwick Warwickshire CV34 4AB / GB | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Colonna, Matthew Oliver, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21723255.2 | 05.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021EP61773 | Priority number, date | EP20200315234 | 06.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20315234 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021224289 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4146304 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/31 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
A61M5/20 (EP);
A61M5/31546 (US);
A61M5/3135 (EP);
A61M2205/3561 (EP);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (US);
A61M2205/587 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6027 (EP);
A61M2205/6036 (EP);
A61M2205/6045 (EP);
A61M2205/6054 (EP);
A61M2205/6063 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | ERGÄNZENDE VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/11] | English: | SUPPLEMENTAL DEVICE FOR AN INJECTION DEVICE | [2023/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF SUPPLÉMENTAIRE POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 06.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015343152 (BUTLER JOSEPH [GB], et al) [A] 7,8* the whole document *; | [X]EP2981313 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [X] 1,5,14,15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 27] - [0028] - [0 85] * * figures 1A, 1B *; | [X]EP2988801 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0048] , [0066] , [0076] * * figures 1-10 *; | [XA]WO2019129619 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [X] 1,3-5,15 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 9 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 6,10-13; | [X]US2020023137 (BYERLY ROY HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,14,15 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0111] * * figures 10-21 * |