EP4149745 - BIOPRINTER AND METHOD FOR CALIBRATION OF THE BIOPRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELLINK Bioprinting AB Långfilsgatan 5 412 77 Göteborg / SE | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRÉN, Anton 431 38 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
FALTPIHL, Peter 416 73 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
STERNÅ, Erik Mölndal 431 47 / SE | 04 /
MICHA, Adam 443 71 Gråbo / SE | 05 /
CAKIR, Ali 413 09 Göteborg / SE | 06 /
MARTINEZ, Hector 413 08 Göteborg / SE | 07 /
GATENHOLM, Erik 411 33 Göteborg / SE | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21724814.5 | 03.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021SE50409 | Priority number, date | SE20200050555 | 12.05.2020 Original published format: SE 2050555 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021230789 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149745 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4149745 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/209, B29C64/393, B33Y50/02, G01B17/00, G01B21/04 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
B29C64/209 (EP,SE,US);
B29C64/227 (SE);
B29C64/393 (EP,SE,US);
B29C64/112 (US);
B33Y50/02 (EP,SE,US);
C12M1/00 (SE);
C12M21/08 (US);
C12M35/04 (US);
G01S15/08 (EP);
B29C64/106 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOPRINTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR KALIBRIERUNG DES BIOPRINTERS | [2023/12] | English: | BIOPRINTER AND METHOD FOR CALIBRATION OF THE BIOPRINTER | [2023/12] | French: | BIOPRINTER ET MÉTHODE DE CALIBRATION DE LA BIOPRINTER | [2023/42] |
Former [2023/12] | BIO-IMPRIMANTE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE DE LA BIO-IMPRIMANTE | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 14.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012054195 (ORGANOVO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,4* paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [ 164] *; | [A]US2015037445 (MURPHY KEITH [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 11] , [ 121] *; | [A]WO2019178086 (FRONTIER BIO CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0066] , [0 67] * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 2 * |